MA H4458 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4345
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - See H4345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - See H4345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A message from His Excellency the Governor returning with his disapproval of certain wording contained Item 1599-0080 and Item 1599-0767 contained in Section 2A, with his disapproval of sections 31 and 32, and with recommendation of amendments to sections 14 and 30 of the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2022 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects (see House, No. 4345, amended).
Title
A message from His Excellency the Governor returning with his disapproval of certain wording contained item 1599-0080 and item 1599-0767 contained in Section 2A, with his disapproval of sections 31 and 32, and with recommendation of amendments to sections 14 and 30 of the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2022 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects (see House, No. 4345, amended).
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | See H4345 |
Same As/Similar To
H4047 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4005
H4049 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4008
H4051 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4010
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
H4053 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4012
H4345 (Replaced by) 2022-03-30 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4456 for section 14
H4678 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - See H4578
H4532 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Published as amended, see H4578
H4578 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Section 73 passed over veto - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 193 )
H4456 (Similar To) 2022-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2022
H4457 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4049 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4008
H4051 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4010
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
H4053 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4012
H4345 (Replaced by) 2022-03-30 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4456 for section 14
H4678 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - See H4578
H4532 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Published as amended, see H4578
H4578 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Section 73 passed over veto - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 193 )
H4456 (Similar To) 2022-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2022
H4457 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4458 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4458.pdf |