MA H4447 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Peabody be authorized to increase the annual compensation for the commissioners of the Peabody Municipal Light Plant. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Increasing the annual compensation of the Peabody Municipal Light Plant commissioners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-07-09 | House | Enacted |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-06-04 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-05-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-05-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S998 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1029 (Similar To) 2017-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H829 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1555 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S2021 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S1029 (Similar To) 2017-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H829 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1555 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S2021 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4447 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4447.pdf |