MA H4439 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2662
Note: Legislation replaced by H4839
Note: Legislation replaced by H4839
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4839
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4839
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Massachusetts Department of Transportation to acquire certain parcels of land in the town of Southborough
Title
Authorizing the Massachusetts Department of Transportation to acquire certain parcels of land in the town of Southborough
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | House | New draft substituted, see H4839 |
2018-07-27 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2018-07-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2018-07-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2018-07-27 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4839 |
2018-04-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-04-30 | House | New draft of H2662 |
2018-04-30 | House | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2662 (Replaces) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4439
S1704 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3632 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H2539 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1686 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H4839 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2018
H4837 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2018
H4838 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 510)
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1704 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3632 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H2539 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1686 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H4839 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2018
H4837 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2018
H4838 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 510)
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4439 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4439.pdf |