MA H4433 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 268 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 268 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city known as the town of West Springfield be authorized to establish four year terms for the office of the mayor. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing a 4-year term for the office of mayor in the city known as the town of West Springfield
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 268 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-09-15 | House | Enacted |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-08-11 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-08-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-08-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-08-08 | House | Report rejected |
2016-08-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-08-08 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2016-07-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2016 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-06-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1292 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1293 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1294 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1943 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2874 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H1293 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1294 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1943 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2874 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4433 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4433.pdf |