MA H4430 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 354 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 354 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the city of Fall River to enter into certain contracts for the operation, maintenance and modification of the wastewater treatment plant, sewers, pump stations, collection system and appurtenances in said city. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to wastewater treatment in the City of Fall River
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 354 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-12-13 | House | Enacted |
2012-12-10 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-10 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-11-19 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-11-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-10-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-10-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-10-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-10-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-09-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4430 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119607&generalCourtId=1 |