MA H4429 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4254
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 361 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 361 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Tyngsborough to grant additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages
Title
Authorizing the town of Tyngsborough to grant additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 361 of the Acts of 2018 |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-27 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-24 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-24 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-08-23 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-05-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-04-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-04-19 | House | New draft of H4254 |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4254 (Replaces) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4429
H4255 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4430
H4430 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 362 of the Acts of 2018
H191 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H4614 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2018
H4768 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 326 of the Acts of 2018
S2627 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4255 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4430
H4430 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 362 of the Acts of 2018
H191 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H4614 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2018
H4768 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 326 of the Acts of 2018
S2627 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4429 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4429.pdf |