MA H4420 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4631
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-4)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4631
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4631
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Chan of Quincy, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Tackey Chan and others that the Division of Medical Assistance be authorized to include dentures, restorative, endodontic and periodontal treatment within its covered services for certain persons ages 65 and older. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to providing dental care to senior citizens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4631 |
2016-06-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2016 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-06-13 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
2016-06-08 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4631 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4420 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4420.pdf |