MA H4418 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H184
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 293 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 293 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Westborough to grant additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Westborough to grant additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 293 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-10-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-10-06 | House | Enacted |
2016-10-03 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2016-09-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2016-09-22 | Senate | Read third, amended, and passed to be engrossed |
2016-09-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-08-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-06-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2016-06-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-06-22 | House | New draft of H184 |
2016-06-22 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H184 (Replaces) 2016-06-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4418 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4418.pdf |