MA H4402 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Puppolo of Springfield, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Angelo J. Puppolo, Jr., that the Massachusetts Teachers’ Retirement Board be authorized to grant creditable service to Sheila Commisso. Public Service.
Title
Authorizing Sheila Commisso to purchase creditable service from the Massachusetts teachers’ retirement board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2023-04-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4219 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4402 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4402.pdf |