MA H4388 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 437 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 437 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the charter of the city known as the town of Agawam. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
RELATIVE TO THE LEADERSHIP AND GOVERNANCE OF THE CITY KNOWN AS THE TOWN OF AGAWAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 437 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-12-24 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-12-20 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-09-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-09-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-09-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-08-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-08-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-08-09 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4388 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119366&generalCourtId=1 |