MA H4378 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Hearing scheduled for 03/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Hearing scheduled for 03/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To implement medical loss ratios for dental benefit plans
Title
To implement medical loss ratios for dental benefit plans
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4378 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4378.pdf |