MA H4377 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4693
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to licensing of liquor retailers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to licensing of liquor retailers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4693 |
2018-04-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1558 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3666
H1290 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H126 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4563
H155 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4693 (Replaced by) 2018-07-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1290 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H126 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4563
H155 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4693 (Replaced by) 2018-07-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4377 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4377.pdf |