MA H4375 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 358 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 358 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Plymouth be authorized to establish an environmental affairs fund for said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Plymouth to establish an environmental affairs fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 358 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-12-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-12-27 | House | Enacted |
2016-12-27 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-12-27 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-08-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-06-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-06-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3298 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2629 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1501 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2902 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H1751 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
H2629 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1501 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2902 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H1751 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4375 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4375.pdf |