MA H4362 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2201
Note: Legislation replaced by H4605
Note: Legislation replaced by H4605
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to qualified health plans.
Title
Relative to qualified health plans.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4605 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 13, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2018-04-04 | House | New draft of H2201 |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from the committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2201 (Replaces) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4362
S566 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S550 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S552 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H4605 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - New draft substituted, see H4617
S566 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S550 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S552 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H4605 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - New draft substituted, see H4617
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4362 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4362.pdf |