MA H4359 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 264 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 264 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disability retirement of Jared MacDonald, a police officer in the town of Bourne. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the disability retirement of Jared Macdonald, a police officer in the town of Bourne
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-16 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 264 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-09-06 | House | Enacted |
2016-09-01 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-09-01 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-08-15 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-06-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2016-06-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2016 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-06-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1647 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1646 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3109 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1645 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2841 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H1646 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3109 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1645 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2841 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4359 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4359.pdf |