MA H4358 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1717
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to nonprofit board member compensation
Title
Relative to nonprofit board member compensation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-03-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-02-12 | House | New draft of H1717 |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported from the committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1717 (Replaces) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4358
H4180 (Similar To) 2023-12-21 - Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2427 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2464 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - New draft substituted, see S2691
S2691 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2024
H4180 (Similar To) 2023-12-21 - Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2427 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2464 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - New draft substituted, see S2691
S2691 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4358 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4358.pdf |