MA H4340 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S735
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - Order adopted (see S735) 114 YEAS to 39 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 258)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - Order adopted (see S735) 114 YEAS to 39 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 258)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Special procedures for consideration of the Senate bill relative to transgender anti-discrimination (Senate, No. 735) ought to be adopted
Title
Special procedures for consideration of the Senate bill relative to transgender anti-discrimination (Senate, No. 735) ought to be adopted
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | House | Order adopted (see S735) 114 YEAS to 39 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 258) |
2016-05-25 | House | Amendment 1 rejected 39 YEAS to 115 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 257) |
2016-05-25 | House | Committee recommended ought to be adopted |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S735 (Replaced by) 2016-07-07 - Reported by S2407
H1310 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2877 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2293 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2295 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1310 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2877 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2293 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2295 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4340 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4340.pdf |