MA H4329 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to comprehensive protection from childhood sexual abuse (House, No. 4326). July 25, 2012.
Title
Relative to comprehensive protection from childhood sexual abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-10-22 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Brownsberger-Flanagan-Ross), in concurrence |
2012-10-18 | House | Committee of Conference appointed (Mariano-Bradley-Harrington) |
2012-10-18 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2012-10-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2409 |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Read second |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Read |
2012-07-25 | House | Motion to reconsider negatived |
2012-07-25 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-25 | House | Substituted for H4326 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4329 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119590&generalCourtId=1 |