MA H4324 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H879
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 409 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 409 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to confidentiality in financial examinations
Title
Relative to confidentiality in financial examinations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 409 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-12-15 | House | Enacted |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-11-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-11-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-11-26 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-07-29 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-29 | House | Amendment adopted |
2014-07-29 | House | Motion to reconsider prevailed |
2014-07-28 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-22 | House | Substituted for H879 |
2014-07-21 | House | New draft of H879 |
2014-07-21 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H879 (Replaces) 2014-07-22 - New draft substituted, see H4324
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4324 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4324.pdf |