MA H4322 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H3009

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to automatic license plate readers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to automatic license plate readers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-23HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2016-05-23HouseNew draft of H3009 and H3102
2016-05-23HouseReported from the committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3009 (Replaces) 2016-05-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4322
H3613 (Similar To) 2015-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3692 (Similar To) 2015-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2032 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2093
S2088 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2178 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback