MA H4310 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4181
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel in the Roxbury section of the city of Boston
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel in the Roxbury section of the city of Boston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-31 | House | New draft substituted, see H5159 |
2022-07-31 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2022-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2022-07-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2022-07-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H5159 |
2021-12-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-12-27 | House | New draft of H4181 |
2021-12-27 | House | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4181 (Replaces) 2021-12-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4310
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
S1774 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
H4899 (Similar To) 2022-11-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 275 of the Acts of 2022
H4900 (Similar To) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2022
H4901 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2022
H4902 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Governor's amendment adopted
H5159 (Replaced by) 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 148 of the Acts of 2022
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3221 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5334
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
S1774 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
H4899 (Similar To) 2022-11-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 275 of the Acts of 2022
H4900 (Similar To) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2022
H4901 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2022
H4902 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Governor's amendment adopted
H5159 (Replaced by) 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 148 of the Acts of 2022
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3221 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5334
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4310 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4310.pdf |