MA H4309 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorizing the town of Norfolk to grant an additional alcoholic beverage license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
AUTHORIZING THE TOWN OF NORFOLK TO GRANT AN ADDITIONAL ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE LICENSE FOR THE SALE OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES NOT TO BE DRUNK ON PREMISES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-08-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/22/2012 from 03:00 PM-03:30 PM in A-2 |
2012-07-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-07-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4309 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119475&generalCourtId=1 |