MA H4298 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-04 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-04 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Preserving PubliclyAssisted Affordable Housing
Title
Preserving Publicly-Assisted Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-04 | No further action taken | |
2009-11-04 | Reported (in part) by S2190 | |
2009-11-02 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Committee On Ways and Means | |
2009-10-28 | Passed to be engrossed 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See Yea and Nay in Supplement, | |
2009-10-28 | Amendment 4 rejected | |
2009-10-28 | Amendment 3 rejected | |
2009-10-28 | Amendment 2 adopted | |
2009-10-28 | Read third | |
2009-10-28 | Rules suspended | |
2009-10-28 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-28 | Substituted for H4132 | |
2009-10-28 | Pending new draft for H4132 | |
2009-10-28 | Reported from the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H4298 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7882&generalCourtId=2 |