MA H428 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2675
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate real estate brokers and salespersons. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To end housing discrimination in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2675 |
2021-07-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H516 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H1733 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1404 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5204
H2244 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H1491 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H840 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S171 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S66 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S1553 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1394 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
S798 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2675 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S208 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
H1733 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1404 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5204
H2244 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H1491 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H840 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S171 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S66 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S1553 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1394 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
S798 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2675 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S208 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H428 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H428.pdf |