MA H4270 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 447 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 447 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the filing of statements of financial condition by public employee retirement systems
Title
Relative to the filing of statements of financial condition by public employee retirement systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 447 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-12-28 | House | Enacted |
2012-12-28 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2012-12-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2012-11-05 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2012-11-01 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-17 | House | Substituted for H3478 |
2012-07-16 | House | Recommended new draft for H3478 |
2012-07-16 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4270 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119439&generalCourtId=1 |