MA H4267 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Elliot Brown, an employee of the Department of Public Health. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Elliot Brown, an employee of the Department of Public Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-05-30 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-05-29 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Read third (title changed) |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-26 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-03-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-26 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1458 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3989 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2018
H3645 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2017
H3462 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 17 of the Acts of 2017
H1464 (Similar To) 2017-04-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2017
H2577 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1419 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3450 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H4991 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 426 of the Acts of 2018
H3989 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2018
H3645 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2017
H3462 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 17 of the Acts of 2017
H1464 (Similar To) 2017-04-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2017
H2577 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1419 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3450 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H4991 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 426 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4267 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4267.pdf |