MA H4263 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4501
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act allowing the town of Dennis to impose a tax By Mr. Turner of Dennis, a petition of Cleon H. Turner (by vote of the town) that the town of Dennis be authorized to impose a local sales tax on the sale of medical marijuana. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Allowing the town of Dennis to impose a tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4501 |
2014-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2014 from 11:30 AM-12:30 PM in B-1 |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-07-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4501 (Replaced by) 2014-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4263 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4263.pdf |