MA H4262 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Patricia Morin, an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Patricia Morin, an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-10-09 | House | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-10-09 | House | For message, see H4466 |
2012-10-04 | Governor returned to the House with veto | |
2012-09-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-09-24 | House | Enacted |
2012-09-24 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-09-24 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-09-20 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2012-09-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-09-17 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-09-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-09-17 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2012-08-16 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2012-08-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-07-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-07-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-27 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2011-08-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4262 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17268&generalCourtId=1 |