MA H4261 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the authority of the town manager of the town of Dedham. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the town manager in the town of Dedham
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-08-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-07-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-07-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4261 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4261.pdf |