MA H4253 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 221 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the classification of certain employees of the South Essex Sewerage District for retirement purposes. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the classification of certain employees of the South Essex Sewerage District

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 221 of the Acts of 2018
2018-07-30SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-07-30HouseEnacted
2018-07-30SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2018-07-30SenateRules suspended
2018-07-30SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2018-06-25SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2018-06-21HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-04-19HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-04-19HouseRules suspended
2018-04-19HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-04-05HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-03-19JointHearing scheduled for 03/20/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1
2018-02-26SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-22HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2018-01-02HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H3474 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H2530 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback