MA H4237 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 161 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 161 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sections 52 to 54, inclusive, 173 to 176, inclusive, and 228 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2013 (see House, No. 4200), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see Attachment D of House, No. 4240). July 8, 2012.
Title
Relative to the electronic benefit transfer program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-27 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 161 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Re-enacted and again laid before the Governor |
2012-07-17 | House | Re-enacted |
2012-07-16 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-07-16 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-07-12 | Senate | Governor's amendment rejected |
2012-07-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-11 | House | Governors amendment rejected - 1 YEAS to 152 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 302) |
2012-07-11 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2012-07-09 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2012-07-09 | House | For message, see H4240, attachment D |
2012-07-09 | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment | |
2012-07-09 | House | Enacted as sections 52, 53 and 54, 173 to 176, inclusive, and 228 of the General Appropriation Bill, see H4200 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4237 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119381&generalCourtId=1 |