MA H4236 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H753

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-21 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to construction defect claims by condominium owners

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to construction defect claims by condominium owners

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-21SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2018-11-19HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-03-09HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-03-09HouseRules suspended
2018-03-09HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-02-20HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-02-20HouseNew draft of H753
2018-02-20HouseReported from the committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H753 (Replaces) 2018-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4236
H3953 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2018
H2078 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4495
H2501 (Similar To) 2017-06-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H729 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1649 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1702 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H4987 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback