MA H418 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to charter school finances. Education.
Title
Relative to transparency and accountability in charter school finance
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D] | Rep. Paul Brodeur [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Sen. Peter Durant [R] |
Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5159 |
2019-04-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H593 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S321 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S321 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H418 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H418.pdf |