MA H418 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4582
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the withholding of diplomas to students meeting all requirements except a score on a state standardized test. Education.
Title
Relative to Massachusetts High School Diplomas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4582 |
2015-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4582 (Replaced by) 2016-08-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2351 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2352 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1427 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1429 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H888 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2351 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2352 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1427 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1429 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H888 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H418 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H418.pdf |