MA H4175 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 449 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 449 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize retirement benefits to employees of the Orleans, Brewster and Eastham Groundwater Protection District. Public Service.
Title
Amending Special Act, Chapter 327 of the Acts of 1988 to Authorize the Orleans, Brewster and Eastham Groundwater Protection District to Provide Retirement Benefits for District Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 449 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-09-24 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-07-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-07 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2012-05-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4175 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=118622&generalCourtId=1 |