MA H4174 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4161
Note: Replaces legislation S2317
Note: Replaces legislation S2317
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to an accelerated transportation development and improvement program for the Commonwealth
Title
Relative to an accelerated transportation development and improvement program for the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-29 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-06-27 | House | Enacted - 127 YEAS to 24 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 294) |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-06-27 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in the further House amendment (see Roll Call No. 235 - 27 Yeas - 9 Nays) |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-06-27 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment |
2012-06-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-06-19 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #233 [26 YEAS - 9 NAYS] |
2012-06-19 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2317 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | Read third |
2012-06-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-19 | Senate | New text substituted, see S2308 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | Read second |
2012-06-18 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, June 19, 2012 |
2012-06-18 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2012-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2308 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Read and referred to the Senate Committee on Ways and Means |
2012-06-13 | House | H4161, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4174 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=118882&generalCourtId=1 |