MA H4173 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to health insurance benefits for elected officials in the town of Andover By Mr. Moran of Lawrence, a petition of Frank A. Moran, James J. Lyons, Jr. and Barry R. Finegold (by vote of the town) that elected officials of the town of Andover be excluded from health care benefits provided by said town. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to health insurance benefits for elected officials in the town of Andover
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-12-08 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2014-11-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-11-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-10-30 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-10-02 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2014-09-29 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Public Service |
2014-09-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-09-29 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4173 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4173.pdf |