MA H4157 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Dedham-Westwood Water District employees to buy back creditable service in the retirement system of Norfolk County. Public Service.
Title
Granting creditable service to employees of the Dedham Westwood water district
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-27 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-06-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-06-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-06-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-05-21 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2012-01-24 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4157 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14231&generalCourtId=1 |