MA H4153 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 450 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 450 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain bridge in the city of Boston as the Navy Cross Recipient PFC Alvin Richard Gale, USMC Memorial Bridge. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the city of Boston as the Navy Cross Recipient PFC Alvin Richard Gale, USMC Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-13 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 450 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2016-12-29 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-12-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-08-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-06-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-05-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2016-03-23 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H131 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H260 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H479 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H744 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4652
H745 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4751 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H260 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H479 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H744 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4652
H745 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4751 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4153 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4153.pdf |