MA H4149 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4293
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Fairhaven to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the Town of Fairhaven issuing a Package Store/All Alcohol license
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4293 |
2012-07-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2012 from 03:00 PM-03:30 PM in A-2 |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-04 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4293 (Replaced by) 2012-11-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 328 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4149 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=118633&generalCourtId=1 |