MA H4146 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on October 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Registry of Motor Vehicles to register eigtheen year old male applicants for military selective service. Transportation.
Title
To insure benefits through enhanced Selective Service registration
Sponsors
Rep. Geoff Diehl [R] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Richard Bastien [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] |
Rep. Timothy Madden [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Rep. George Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-07-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-06-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2012 from 12:30 PM-01:30 PM in B-1 |
2012-06-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-04 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2011-10-24 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4146 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17476&generalCourtId=1 |