MA H4145 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to representation on the board of trustees for soldiers’ memorials in the town of Orange. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to representation on the board of trustees for soldiers’ memorials in the town of Orange

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-13SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2018-12-13SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-11-21SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-11-19HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-02-07HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-02-07HouseRules suspended
2018-02-07HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-02-06HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-01-25SenateSenate concurred
2018-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback