MA H414 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to school improvement plans. Education.
Title
Relative to school improvement plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-10-09 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2013-07-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-07-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-06-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1 (10:00-1:00); Room 222 (1:00-3:00) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H414 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H414.pdf |