MA H4132 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4306
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of New Bedford be authorized to issue an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of New Bedford to issue an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4306 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-28 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4306 (Replaced by) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 424 of the Acts of 2016
H4734 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 451 of the Acts of 2016
H323 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H807 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1211 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1212 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4734 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 451 of the Acts of 2016
H323 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H807 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1211 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1212 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4132 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4132.pdf |