MA H413 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the annual stipend for members of the Commonwealth’s hazardous material response teams. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Increasing the annual stipend for members of the Commonwealth’s hazardous material response teams
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-11-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S404 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H413 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H413.pdf |