MA H4103 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to a certain conservation restriction in the town of Webster. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a certain conservation restriction in the town of Webster

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 482 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 482 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted - Roll Call #547 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2018
2018-07-31SenateLaid before the Governor
2018-07-31SenateEnacted - Roll Call #547 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0]
2018-07-31HouseEnacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 482)
2018-07-30SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-07-30SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-07-25SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-07-25HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-07-25HouseRules suspended
2018-02-07HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-02-07HouseRules suspended
2018-02-07HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-02-06HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-01-02SenateSenate concurred
2017-12-28HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3781 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4122
H4122 (Similar To) 2018-10-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback