MA H4101 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H3457

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the Massachusetts Port Authority community advisory committee

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Massachusetts Port Authority community advisory committee

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-01-05HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-01-05HouseRules suspended
2018-01-05HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-12-28HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-12-28HouseNew draft of H3457
2017-12-28HouseReported from the committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3457 (Replaces) 2017-12-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4101
H2566 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4088 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2018
H3803 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4088
S2561 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Export Development

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback