MA H4094 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3877
Note: Legislation replaced by H4723
Note: Legislation replaced by H4723
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-07 - Amendment adopted (as recommended by the House committee on Ways and Means), see H4723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-07 - Amendment adopted (as recommended by the House committee on Ways and Means), see H4723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to transportation infrastructure value capture
Title
Relative to transportation infrastructure value capture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-07 | House | Amendment adopted (as recommended by the House committee on Ways and Means), see H4723 |
2016-11-07 | House | Read second |
2016-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-11-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2016-11-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2016-11-07 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a bill with the same title, see H4723 |
2016-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-03-17 | House | New draft of H3877 |
2016-03-17 | House | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3877 (Replaces) 2016-03-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4094
H3613 (Similar To) 2015-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3692 (Similar To) 2015-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2032 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2093
S2088 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2178 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4723 (Replaced by) 2016-11-17 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3613 (Similar To) 2015-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3692 (Similar To) 2015-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2032 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2093
S2088 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2178 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4723 (Replaced by) 2016-11-17 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4094 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4094.pdf |