MA H4071 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4079
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - Published as amended, see H4079
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - Published as amended, see H4079
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Dempsey of Haverhill, for the committee on Ways and Means, on a part of House, No. 3898, a Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2012 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects (House, No. 4071). May 7, 2012.
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2012 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | House | Published as amended, see H4079 |
2012-05-10 | House | Engrossed, as amended |
2012-05-10 | House | Further amendment adopted |
2012-05-10 | House | Motion to reconsider prevailed |
2012-05-09 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 147 YEAS to 4 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 244) |
2012-05-09 | House | Amendment 6 rejected |
2012-05-09 | House | Amendment 3 adopted |
2012-05-09 | House | Amendment 2 adopted |
2012-05-09 | House | Read third |
2012-05-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-05-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-05-07 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-05-07 | House | Reported on a part of H3898 |
2012-05-07 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4079 (Replaced by) 2012-06-06 - Section 4 passed over veto - See Roll Call 234 (36 Yeas - 1 Nays)
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4071 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=117693&generalCourtId=1 |