MA H4067 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2654
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a cranberry bog renovation tax credit
Title
Relative to a cranberry bog renovation tax credit
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-12-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-12-14 | House | New draft of H2654 |
2017-12-14 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2654 (Replaces) 2017-12-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4067
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1664 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
S1610 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
S1611 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1664 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
S1610 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
S1611 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4067 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4067.pdf |